Global Patent Index - EP 1056059 A2

EP 1056059 A2 2000-11-29 - Device for simultaneously magnetic influencing a plurality of acousto-magnetic anti-theft elements

Title (en)

Device for simultaneously magnetic influencing a plurality of acousto-magnetic anti-theft elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur gleichzeitigen magnetischen Beeinflussung einer Vielzahl von akustomagnetischen Warensicherungselementen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'influence magnétique simultanée de plusieurs éléments acousto-magnétiques de sécurité pour marchandises

Publication

EP 1056059 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109757 A

Priority

DE 19923859 A

Abstract (en)

Acoustic-magnetic securuity tags on goods in a store are passed through a deactivation unit (1) at the check out. The unit is in the form of a duct through which the items are passed.The duct has a number of deactivation coils (4,5) and are surrounded by an iron sheath (10). The coils are supplied by a controlled (7) power supply (8).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung setzt sich das Ziel, eine Vorrichtung zur gleichzeitigen magnetischen Beeinflussung einer Vielzahl von Warensicherungselementen bereitzustellen, mit welcher unabhängig von der Lage der Warensicherungselemente schnell und sicher eine große Vielzahl der Elemente aktiviert oder deaktiviert werden kann, wobei die Anlage wirtschaftlich aufbaubar und auch installierbar sein soll. Auch sollen an palettierten Waren angeordnete Warensicherungselemente gleichzeitig beeinflußt werden können. Die Installation soll keine teuren und aufwendigen Elektroinstallationen erfordern und es ist wünschenswert, die Vorrichtungen in Förderbandanlagen integrieren zu können, beispielsweise in Produktionsanlagen, Fördersystemen von Warenlagern und dergleichen. Es wird daher mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen eine Vorrichtung zu gleichzeitigen magnetischen Beeinflussung einer Vielzahl von Warensicherungselementen für die Verwendung in akustomagnetischen Sende-/Empfangs-Systemen, bestehend aus einer Mehrzahl von mit Strom beaufschlagbaren Kupferspulen, die in einem ein Volumen umgebenden Rahmenbereich angeordnet sind und jede Spule im vom Volumen abgewandten Bereich mit einer Eisenmasse hinterfüttert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2411 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056059 A2 20001129; EP 1056059 A3 20010502; DE 19923859 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI