Global Patent Index - EP 1056061 A2

EP 1056061 A2 2000-11-29 - Anti-theft element

Title (en)

Anti-theft element

Title (de)

Warensicherungselement

Title (fr)

Elément de sécurité pour marchandises

Publication

EP 1056061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110772 A

Priority

DE 19923862 A

Abstract (en)

The security device is in the form of an element having a ferrite core (2) onto which is wound a copper coil(3) that is connected to a capacitor (4). The element is coupled to an acousto-magnetic transmitter/receiver system and is mounted on the article to be protected.

Abstract (de)

Um ein Warensicherungselement (1) bereitzustellen, welches bei geringem wirtschaftlichen Fertigungsaufwand miniaturisierbar ist und darüber hinaus in kleinste und vor allen Dingen variierbare Gehäuseformen integrierbar ist. Die Störbarkeit soll reduziert werden und eine mutwillige Deaktivierung ausgeschlossen werden. Darüber hinaus soll die Detektionsgröße erweitert werden, so daß die Antennen der Sende-/Empfangs-Anlagen verkleinert und/oder die Abstände vergrößert werden können, wird mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen ein Warensicherungselement zur Verwendung in Verbindung mit akustomagnetischen Sende-/Empfangs-Systemen, bestehend aus einem stabförmigen Ferritelement, wenigstens einer Spule (10) in Form einer auf das Ferritelement aufgebrachten Kupferdraht-Wicklung und einem zur Spule (10) parallel geschalteten Kondensator (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2411 (2013.01); G08B 13/2408 (2013.01); G08B 13/2434 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056061 A2 20001129; EP 1056061 A3 20010502; DE 19923862 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI