Global patent index - EP 1056108 A1

EP 1056108 A1 2000-11-29 - Actuating for a multipolar circuit breaker having a variable distance between poles

Title (en)

Actuating for a multipolar circuit breaker having a variable distance between poles

Title (de)

Steuerung für einen mehrpoligen Leistungschalter mit variablem Abstand zwischen Polen

Title (fr)

Commande d'un disjoncteur à plusieurs pôles ayant une distance entre pôles variable

Publication

EP 1056108 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401451 A

Priority

FR 9906785 A

Abstract (en)

The multiple pole switch command mechanism has a rotating shaft (1) with several cams (3) each associated with a pole switch (9). An oscillating lever (6) couples the cam to the pole by a rod (4) and to the moving contact by a pusher (8). Cam rotating moveme is thus converted to contact movement. An intermediate common section (5) couples all the rods together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/02 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2013.01); H01H 33/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056108 A1 20001129; EP 1056108 B1 20060719; DE 60029387 D1 20060831; DE 60029387 T2 20070719; FR 2794279 A1 20001201; FR 2794279 B1 20010720

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140524

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60029387

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140524

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60029387

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC ENERGY FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120806

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC ENERGY FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60029387

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60029387

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60029387

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER, VOLPERT, KANDLBINDER, DE

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070420

2006-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60029387

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-08-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI