Global Patent Index - EP 1056153 A2

EP 1056153 A2 2000-11-29 - Antenna device for a radio telephone in a vehicle

Title (en)

Antenna device for a radio telephone in a vehicle

Title (de)

Antennenvorrichtung für ein Funktelefon in einem Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' antenne pour appareil radiotéléphone dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 1056153 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110409 A

Priority

DE 19923661 A

Abstract (en)

The antenna arrangement has a first antenna (12) connected to a radio telephone via an antenna line (22) for optimal link quality. There is a second antenna (14) to enable telephony with limited link quality if the first antenna fails. An electrical switch (30) is provided to switch the second antenna to the radio telephone if the first antenna fails. The first antenna is attached to the vehicle by a breakable attachment element (36), and the switch automatically connects the second antenna to the antenna line if the attachment element breaks

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antennenvorrichtung für ein Funktelefon in einem Fahrzeug mit einer ersten Antenne (12), welche zum Telefonieren bei optimaler Verbindungsqualität über eine Antennenleitung (22) mit dem Funktelefon verbunden ist, einer zweiten Antenne (14), welche bei einem Ausfall der ersten Antenne (12) zumindest Telefonieren mit eingeschränkter Verbindungsqualität ermöglicht, und mit einem elektrischen Schalter (30), der nach einem Ausfall der ersten Antenne (12) die zweite Antenne (14) an das Funktelefon schaltet. Dieses wird dadurch realisiert, dass die erste Antenne (12) mit einem zerbrechlichen Befestigungselement (36) am Fahrzeug befestigt ist und dass der Schalter (30) beim Zerbrechen des Befestigungselements (36) durch mechanische Mittel (38, 44) automatisch die zweite Antenne (14) an Stelle der ersten Antenne (12) mit der Antennenleitung (22) verbindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/32; H01Q 3/24; H01Q 21/28; H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/10 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01); H01Q 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923661 A1 20001123; EP 1056153 A2 20001129; EP 1056153 A3 20030604; US 6275194 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI