Global Patent Index - EP 1056153 A3

EP 1056153 A3 2003-06-04 - Antenna device for a radio telephone in a vehicle

Title (en)

Antenna device for a radio telephone in a vehicle

Title (de)

Antennenvorrichtung für ein Funktelefon in einem Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' antenne pour appareil radiotéléphone dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 1056153 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110409 A

Priority

DE 19923661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1056153A2] The antenna arrangement has a first antenna (12) connected to a radio telephone via an antenna line (22) for optimal link quality. There is a second antenna (14) to enable telephony with limited link quality if the first antenna fails. An electrical switch (30) is provided to switch the second antenna to the radio telephone if the first antenna fails. The first antenna is attached to the vehicle by a breakable attachment element (36), and the switch automatically connects the second antenna to the antenna line if the attachment element breaks

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/32; H01Q 3/24; H01Q 21/28; H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/10 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01); H01Q 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0497704 A1 19920805 - DAIICHI DENSHI KOGYO [JP]
  • [A] WO 9831078 A1 19980716 - WHITAKER CORP [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 02 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 380 (M - 1295) 14 August 1992 (1992-08-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923661 A1 20001123; EP 1056153 A2 20001129; EP 1056153 A3 20030604; US 6275194 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI