Global Patent Index - EP 1056168 A2

EP 1056168 A2 2000-11-29 - Cable joining station

Title (en)

Cable joining station

Title (de)

Kabelverbindungsstation

Title (fr)

Station de jonction de câbles

Publication

EP 1056168 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500058 A

Priority

ES 9901146 A

Abstract (en)

The station of the present invention is provided with gripping members having grips and being driven in a circular movement combined with the vertical movement of a head where said gripping members are fitted allowing the folding operation consisting in positioning the ends of a cable parallel to one another in such a way that subsequently in another station of said machine, such ends can be supplied with terminals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056168 A2 20001129; EP 1056168 A3 20010829

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI