Global patent index - EP 1056313 A2

EP 1056313 A2 2000-11-29 - Microwave oven with safety interlock

Title (en)

Microwave oven with safety interlock

Title (de)

Mikrowellenofen mit Sicherheitsverriegelung

Title (fr)

Four à micro-ondes à système de verrouillage de sécurité

Publication

EP 1056313 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308610 A

Priority

KR 19990019132 A

Abstract (en)

The microswitches (131, 132, 133) of the safety interlock assembly of a microwave oven are mounted on a PCB (130) and connected to a main circuit board (104) by ribbon cables (136a, 136b) between the circuit boards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/68 (2006.01); F24C 7/02 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01); H05B 6/64 (2006.01); H05B 6/66 (2006.01); H05B 6/76 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6417 (2013.01); H05B 6/6414 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056313 A2 20001129; EP 1056313 A3 20020206; AU 5827899 A 20001130; CA 2288945 A1 20001127; JP 2000337640 A 20001208; KR 20000074891 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 05B 6/76 A, 7H 05B 6/64 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI