Global Patent Index - EP 1056317 A2

EP 1056317 A2 2000-11-29 - Device and method for generating X-rays

Title (en)

Device and method for generating X-rays

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verahren zur Erzeugung von Röntgenstrahlen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de production de rayons-x

Publication

EP 1056317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110869 A

Priority

DE 19924204 A

Abstract (en)

The X ray measurement of a sample (18) is carried using an Xray source that is generated by directing a laser (12) at a foil disc(13). The laser produces local atomic plasma craters on the disc and the X rays are transmitted. X ray fluorescent emissions (22( are produced that are transmitted to a detector (21).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Einrichtung (10) und ein Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Röntgenstrahlen (11) vorgeschlagen, bei dem Laserlicht (12) auf die Oberfläche (14) eines Substrats (13) gerichtet wird. Dadurch wird auf der Oberfläche des Substrats (13) ein eine Röntgenstrahlenquelle bildendes Substrat-Atomplasma (16) erzeugt. Dabei ist das Substrat (13) in Richtung (17) des Laserlichts (12) vor einer zu untersuchenden Probe (18) angeordnet, wobei die Probe (18) für Analyse- oder Nachweiszwecke mit den Röntgenstrahlen (11) beaufschlagt wird, die durch das Substrat-Atomplasma (16) erzeugt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05G 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05G 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05G 2/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1056317 A2 20001129; EP 1056317 A3 20030521; DE 19924204 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20051030

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI