Global patent index - EP 1056328 A1

EP 1056328 A1 2000-12-06 - COMBINE WITH A DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC CLEANING REGULATION

Title (en)

COMBINE WITH A DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC CLEANING REGULATION

Title (de)

MÄHDRESCHER MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN REINIGUNGSEINSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DU NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 1056328 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908895 A

Priority

  • DE 19807145 A
  • EP 9900963 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807145A1] The invention relates to a combine with a cleaning device (1), having a screening device (2) with at least one screen (2A, 2B) in which the harvested products conveyed to the thresher and to the separation device are cleaned and at least one adjustable blower (3) for exposing the screening device (3) to an air flow. The width of the openings of the sifting device (2) and the revolutions of the blower (3) can be mechanically regulated by at least one regulation organ. According to the invention, at least one sensor (4) is provided whose measuring signal (S/4) directly or indirectly indicates a quantity of harvested products loaded on the combine, especially on the cleaning device. Optimal regulation of the cleaning device, especially the width of the openings of the screen, is performed by an adjusting organ (20A, 20B) depending on the signal (S/4) of the sensor (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01D 41/12; A01F 12/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 41/127 (2006.01); A01F 12/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01F 12/448 (2013.01); A01D 41/1276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941967A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807145 A1 19990902; DE 19807145 C2 19991209; AT 256383 T 20040115; DK 1056328 T3 20040419; DK 1056328 T4 20080211; EP 1056328 A1 20001206; EP 1056328 B1 20031217; EP 1056328 B2 20071003; US 7846013 B1 20101207; WO 9941967 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150213

2016-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150213

2015-09-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20150228

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-06-20 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2008-02-11 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040214

2007-11-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-10-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20071003

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEERE & COMPANY

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-04-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-02-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908108

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011129

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE