Global patent index - EP 1056332 A1

EP 1056332 A1 2000-12-06 - APPARATUS FOR SHEARING THE STEMS OF CROPS AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR SHEARING THE STEMS OF CROPS AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHERUNG VON PFLANZENSTENGELN UND DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CISAILLER LES TIGES DE PLANTES CULTIVEES ET ANALOGUE

Publication

EP 1056332 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907953 A

Priority

  • NL 9900092 W
  • NL 1008428 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943200A1] An apparatus for shearing the stems of crops and the like comprises first and second shearing members (1, 2) movable to and away from each other, and a drive for effecting the movement of at least one shearing member. The drive of the shearing member is such that the relative movement of the shearing members (1, 2) includes both a component of motion perpendicular to the cutting plane and a component of motion parallel thereto. The first shearing member (1) is stationary and constructed as anvil, whereas the second shearing member (2) is movable. The drive of the second shearing member (2) is constructed as circular drive such that the component of motion of the second shearing member (2) parallel to the cutting plane is continued in the same direction after engagement with the first shearing member (1) and before the returning movement is started. The apparatus according to the invention excels by good cutting performance and a wide usability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01G 5/00; A23N 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01G 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01G 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/25 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943200A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943200 A1 19990902; DE 69909439 D1 20030814; EP 1056332 A1 20001206; EP 1056332 B1 20030709; NL 1008428 C2 19990830

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040222

2004-07-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040222

2003-10-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-10-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909439

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL