Global patent index - EP 1056370 A1

EP 1056370 A1 2000-12-06 - HAND CONTROLLER FOR BED AND MATTRESS ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

HAND CONTROLLER FOR BED AND MATTRESS ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

HANDBEDIENGERÄT FÜR EINE VERSTELLBARE MATRATZE

Title (fr)

UNITE DE COMMANDE MANUELLE POUR ENSEMBLE LIT ET MATELAS

Publication

EP 1056370 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908103 A

Priority

  • US 9902771 W
  • US 7508598 P
  • US 6447298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942021A1] A hand-held controller (50) is provided for controlling at least one function of a bed and mattress assembly (52). The hand-held controller (50) includes a button (264) engageable to control the at least one function of the bed and mattress assembly (52), and a display (86) configured to provide feedback to a user regarding the at least one function. The display (86) simultaneously displays a graphical image (352, 354, 356, 364, 366, 368, 370, 476, 478, 674, 676) and numerical data (360, 362, 482, 484, 678) when the button (264) is engaged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/00 (2006.01); A47C 17/86 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A47C 21/04 (2006.01); A47C 27/10 (2006.01); A61G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/048 (2013.01); A47B 2220/0097 (2013.01); A61G 2203/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942021A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942021 A1 19990826; AT 345070 T 20061215; AU 2761599 A 19990906; BR 9908013 A 20010904; CA 2321297 A1 19990826; CA 2321297 C 20021015; DE 69933995 D1 20061228; DE 69933995 T2 20070315; DE 69940229 D1 20090212; EP 1056370 A1 20001206; EP 1056370 B1 20061115; JP 2002503504 A 20020205; JP 2004089715 A 20040325

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160202

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-02-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070226

2007-02-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070215

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69933995

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-11-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-11-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-11-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HILL-ROM SERVICES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041006

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL