Global Patent Index - EP 1056394 A1

EP 1056394 A1 2000-12-06 - UROLOGY WORKSTATION WITH X-RAY SOURCE AND X-RAY RECEIVER SYSTEM

Title (en)

UROLOGY WORKSTATION WITH X-RAY SOURCE AND X-RAY RECEIVER SYSTEM

Title (de)

UROLOGISCHER ARBEITSPLATZ MIT EINER RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNGSQUELLE- UND STRAHLUNGSEMPFÄNGER-ANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

POSTE DE TRAVAIL EN UROLOGIE, EQUIPE D'UN DISPOSITIF A SOURCE DE RAYONS X ET RECEPTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1056394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955774 A

Priority

  • DE 9903042 W
  • DE 19843680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19843680C1] The workstation has a radiation-detector arrangement that includes a holding element connected to a patient couch (1). An X-ray source (6) and detector (7) are fixed to the holding element and can be moved in the x and y directions. The X-ray source and detector can be moved synchronously through the same amount in both the x and y directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 6/00 (2006.01); A61B 6/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 6/50 (2013.01); A61B 6/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0016694A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843680 C1 20000224; EP 1056394 A1 20001206; WO 0016694 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040202

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE