Global Patent Index - EP 1056424 A1

EP 1056424 A1 2000-12-06 - CHAIR INCORPORATING AIR CUSHIONS

Title (en)

CHAIR INCORPORATING AIR CUSHIONS

Title (de)

MIT LUFTKISSEN AUSGERÜSTETER SESSEL

Title (fr)

FAUTEUIL DOTE DE COUSSINS D'AIR

Publication

EP 1056424 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905979 A

Priority

  • AU 9900094 W
  • AU PP311198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942069A1] A chair that is suitable for supporting invalids and aged persons who are obliged to remain seated for protracted periods of time. The chair has a pivotable seat support structure (10), a pivotable back support structure (11) and a pivotable leg rest (12). An air-containing cushion (36) is secured to the seat support structure and two overlapping air-containing cushions (37 and 38) are secured to the backrest support structure. Also, compressible material sheets are employed to underlay and overlay the air-containing cushions, and an upholstery material is employed to cover the overlay. The chair is characterised in that each of the cushions comprises a bladder which is formed from a pliable, gas impermeable material and in that each bladder is charged with air in an amount not greater than 60 % of the maximum contained volume of the bladder whereby the air may freely be displaced within the bladder and, as a consequence, shaping may be imparted to the cushion to complement that of a person who occupies the chair.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/10; A47C 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2006.01); A47C 1/034 (2006.01); A47C 4/54 (2006.01); A47C 27/08 (2006.01); A47C 27/10 (2006.01); A47C 31/11 (2006.01); A61G 5/00 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/006 (2013.01); A47C 4/54 (2013.01); A61G 5/1091 (2016.11); A61G 5/1043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942069 A1 19990826; AU 2604399 A 19990906; AU 736179 B2 20010726; DE 69916584 D1 20040527; DE 69916584 T2 20040923; EP 1056424 A1 20001206; EP 1056424 A4 20020717; EP 1056424 B1 20040421; JP 2002503518 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161201

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

2013-07-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

2013-07-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: K CARE PTY LTD., AU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: K.D.B. ENGINEERING PTY LTD., EDWARDSTOWN, AU

- Document: DE 69916584

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: K CARE PTY LTD., AU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: K.D.B. ENGINEERING PTY LTD., EDWARDSTOWN, S.A., AU

- Document: DE 69916584

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-06-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130530 AND 20130605

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69916584

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER, DE

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090212 AND 20090218

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916584 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-07-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL