Global patent index - EP 1056517 A1

EP 1056517 A1 2000-12-06 - DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HUMAN BODY USING COLOURED AND SOUND WAVES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HUMAN BODY USING COLOURED AND SOUND WAVES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERS MIT HILFE VON FARB- UND SCHALL-WELLENGENERATOREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CORPS HUMAIN UTILISANT DES GENERATEURS D'ONDES COLOREES ET SONORES

Publication

EP 1056517 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98910806 A

Priority

FR 9800343 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942180A1] The invention concerns a device for treating the human body using generators of coloured light waves and sound waves, essentially characterised in that it comprises a generator of coloured light waves associated with a sound wave generator; for each emission of a very specific dominant colour wave, selected among the colours of the rainbow, corresponds a sound wave emission of similar wave length and the coloured and sound wave generators comprise means for adjusting the intensity of said waves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 21/00 (2006.01); A61N 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 21/00 (2013.01); A61N 5/0618 (2013.01); A61M 2021/0016 (2013.01); A61M 2021/0027 (2013.01); A61M 2021/0044 (2013.01); A61N 2005/0663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942180A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942180 A1 19990826; AU 6504698 A 19990906; CA 2321499 A1 19990826; EP 1056517 A1 20001206

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOME, ALEXANDRE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOME, ALEXANDRE

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOME, ALEXANDRE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOME, ALEXANDRE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE