Global patent index - EP 1056534 A1

EP 1056534 A1 2000-12-06 - TWIRLING STICK FOR A MIXING DEVICE

Title (en)

TWIRLING STICK FOR A MIXING DEVICE

Title (de)

MISCHQUIRL FÜR EINE MISCHEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

FOUET A MELANGER POUR MELANGEUR

Publication

EP 1056534 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963547 A

Priority

  • DE 19755059 A
  • EP 9807988 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755059A1] The invention relates to a twirling stick for a mixing device with two mixing sticks arranged at a distance in a substantially parallel position with respect to its rotational axis and a conveyor spiral arranged thereon, whereby said mixing stick is joined to a drive motor on one end and a feed pump on the other. The conveyor spiral is arranged in the vicinity of a conveyor funnel which is tapered towards the feed pump. The mixing device has a mixing area below the conveyor funnel into which a duct flows so that water can be introduced. The inventive twirling stick is designed in such a way that it the mixing process is made more efficient and lumps are avoided wherever possible. At least one semi-mixing stick (2a) is thus arranged in the orbit of the mixing sticks (2) between the mixing sticks. The angular distance of the semi-mixing stick to a mixing stick arranged in a prior position in the direction of rotation ranges from 45 DEG to 135 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/00; B01F 7/16; B28C 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01); B28C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00583 (2013.01); B01F 7/00408 (2013.01); B28C 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929407A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755059 A1 19990701; DE 19755059 C2 19991125; AT 202725 T 20010715; EP 1056534 A1 20001206; EP 1056534 B1 20010704; HU 0100346 A2 20010628; HU 0100346 A3 20020128; PL 340801 A1 20010226; SK 8372000 A3 20001009; WO 9929407 A1 19990617; YU 32500 A 20021115

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MELCHIOR MARTIN THEODOR

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-12-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011209

2001-12-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011209

2001-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-10-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800975

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-09

2001-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000519;SI PAYMENT 20000519

2001-07-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-07-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-07-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 202725

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000519;SI PAYMENT 20000519