Global patent index - EP 1056545 A1

EP 1056545 A1 2000-12-06 - SCREW-TYPE SOLID BOWL CENTRIFUGE WITH MULTISTAGE PLANETARY GEAR TRAIN

Title (en)

SCREW-TYPE SOLID BOWL CENTRIFUGE WITH MULTISTAGE PLANETARY GEAR TRAIN

Title (de)

VOLLMANTEL-SCHNECKENZENTRIFUGE MIT MEHRSTUFIGEM UMLAUFGETRIEBE

Title (fr)

CENTRIFUGEUSE A VIS A BOL PLEIN A ENGRENAGE PLANETAIRE A PLUSIEURS ETAGES

Publication

EP 1056545 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99902523 A

Priority

  • DE 19806374 A
  • EP 9900055 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806374C1] In the split drive a bearing drum is placed between two gearboxes in order to reduce the spacing of the bearings and increase the whirling speed of the decanter. An epicyclic gearing is split into two units (7,8) connected by a relatively small shaft (13) so that the bearing (5) between the units is small.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/2016 (2013.01); B04B 2001/2025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942220A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806374 C1 19990701; DK 1056545 T3 20020916; DK 1056545 T4 20121029; EP 1056545 A1 20001206; EP 1056545 B1 20020605; EP 1056545 B2 20120801; JP 2002503549 A 20020205; JP 4212236 B2 20090121; NO 20004078 A 20000815; NO 20004078 D0 20000815; NO 319825 B1 20050919; US 6387032 B1 20020514; WO 9942220 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-11-13 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2012-10-29 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2012-09-20 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59901620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-08-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2004-08-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: FLOTTWEG GMBH & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20030301

2004-08-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HILLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20030301

2004-01-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: FLOTTWEG GMBH & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20030301

2004-01-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HILLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FLOTTWEG GMBH & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HILLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE