Global Patent Index - EP 1056550 A1

EP 1056550 A1 2000-12-06 - CLEANING HEAD IN A DEVICE FOR CLEANING THE WINDOW AND FACADE SURFACES

Title (en)

CLEANING HEAD IN A DEVICE FOR CLEANING THE WINDOW AND FACADE SURFACES

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSKOPF EINER REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FENSTER- UND FASSADENFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

TETE DE NETTOYAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR SURFACE DE FENETRES ET DE FA ADES

Publication

EP 1056550 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907259 A

Priority

  • DE 9900134 W
  • DE 19806928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942226A1] The present invention relates to a cleaning head (1) comprising a plurality of hydrostatic bearings (16) which form a thin layer of water between the surface to be cleaned and the cleaning head (1) during operation thereof, wherein said cleaning head (1) is capable of sliding displacement on the water layer. When the water supply to the cleaning head (1) is interrupted at the end of the cleaning process, pushers (21) of lifting devices (20) extend outwardly so as to protrude from the front plane (22) of the cleaning head (1), wherein said pushers maintain a gap of a predetermined value between the cleaning head (1) and the surface to be cleaned. Air can also be injected in the area of the cleaning head (1) and drawn off through a suction channel (3) of said cleaning head so that any residual liquid can be removed from below the cleaning head (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; A47L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942226A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857668 A1 20000302; DE 19857668 C2 20000803; AT 224244 T 20021015; AU 2711299 A 19990906; DE 19806928 A1 19990902; DE 19806928 C2 20000120; EP 1056550 A1 20001206; EP 1056550 B1 20020918; ES 2184414 T3 20030401; WO 9942226 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120121

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184414 T3

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902748 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224244 T 20021015

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011112

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI