Global Patent Index - EP 1056556 A1

EP 1056556 A1 2000-12-06 - FLANGING DEVICE WITH PRESSING AND CLAMPING ELEMENTS

Title (en)

FLANGING DEVICE WITH PRESSING AND CLAMPING ELEMENTS

Title (de)

BÖRDELEINRICHTUNG MIT PRESS- UND SPANNELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SERTISSAGE A ELEMENTS DE PRESSION ET DE SERRAGE

Publication

EP 1056556 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906187 A

Priority

  • DE 29801147 U
  • DE 29801153 U
  • EP 9900402 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6477880B1] A flanging or hemming device (1) is provided with an external flanging unit (6) and/or an internal flanging unit (7) as well as a clamping device (3). The clamping device (3) has one or more leading pressing and clamping elements (71) which are movable or deformable and can be adjusted in accordance with the place or time and/or force with which they act on the workpiece or work-pieces (9). The pressing and clamping elements (71) are notably elastically deformable. They can also comprise a spring (72) or be fluidically pre-stressed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 19/00 (2006.01); B21D 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 19/00 (2013.01); B21D 39/021 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53791 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937419A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6477880 B1 20021112; BR 9907221 A 20001024; CA 2318544 A1 19990729; EP 1056556 A1 20001206; EP 1056556 B1 20011128; ES 2164488 T3 20020216; WO 9937419 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050122

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164488 T3

2002-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020130

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900465 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-12-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011210

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIMMER, ERNST

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE