Global Patent Index - EP 1056560 A1

EP 1056560 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR MAKING ALUMINIUM ALLOY STRIPS WITH HIGH SURFACE HOMOGENEITY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING ALUMINIUM ALLOY STRIPS WITH HIGH SURFACE HOMOGENEITY

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON ALUMINIUMBAND HOHER OBERFLÄSCHENHOMOGENITÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BANDES EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM A GRANDE HOMOGENEITE DE SURFACE

Publication

EP 1056560 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99903745 A

Priority

  • FR 9900319 W
  • FR 9801987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774930A1] The invention concerns aluminium alloy strips with high surface homogeneity as well as a method for making said strips based on continuous casting between rolls comprising an injector whereof the upper lip is recessed relative to the lower lip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C25D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0622 (2013.01); B22D 11/0642 (2013.01); C25D 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941031A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774930 A1 19990820; FR 2774930 B1 20000519; AT 294038 T 20050515; AU 2429499 A 19990830; BR 9907880 A 20001017; CN 1222381 C 20051012; CN 1289275 A 20010328; DE 69924981 D1 20050602; EP 1056560 A1 20001206; EP 1056560 B1 20050427; JP 2002502708 A 20020129; NO 20004061 A 20001013; NO 20004061 D0 20000811; US 2002084056 A1 20020704; US 6834708 B1 20041228; US 6948550 B2 20050927; WO 9941031 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-10-16 [REG FR AU] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AU

2009-01-09 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2006-07-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-02-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NOVELIS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-11-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-07-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69924981

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2004-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR MAKING ALUMINIUM ALLOY STRIPS WITH HIGH SURFACE HOMOGENEITY

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010521

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT