Global Patent Index - EP 1056561 A1

EP 1056561 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR PROTECTING A NON-FERROUS LIQUID METAL FROM OXIDATION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PROTECTING A NON-FERROUS LIQUID METAL FROM OXIDATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÜTZEN FLÜSSIGER NICHTEISENMETALLE VOR OXYDATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PROTEGER DE L'OXYDATION UN METAL LIQUIDE NON FERREUX

Publication

EP 1056561 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99936045 A

Priority

  • FR 9900434 W
  • FR 9802315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775209A1] The method consists of covering the metal surface with a mixture of carbon dioxide, an oxidizing gas, argon and xenon to produce a protective layer against the surrounding atmosphere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 21/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 27/003 (2013.01); B22D 21/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943458A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775209 A1 19990827; FR 2775209 B1 20000505; AU 3256699 A 19990915; AU 756719 B2 20030123; CA 2321901 A1 19990902; DE 69900499 D1 20020110; EP 1056561 A1 20001206; EP 1056561 B1 20011128; IL 137903 D0 20011031; NO 20004270 A 20000927; NO 20004270 D0 20000825; US 6500230 B1 20021231; WO 9943458 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-05-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900499 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL