Global Patent Index - EP 1056589 A1

EP 1056589 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A SHEARING AND COMPACTING PRESS AND SHEARING AND COMPACTING PRESS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING A SHEARING AND COMPACTING PRESS AND SHEARING AND COMPACTING PRESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SCHERPAKETIERPRESSE UND SCHERPAKETIERPRESSE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE PRESSE A PAQUETS PAR CISAILLEMENT ET PRESSE A PAQUETS PAR CISAILLEMENT

Publication

EP 1056589 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906066 A

Priority

  • DE 9900160 W
  • DE 19804789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804789A1] The invention relates to a method and to a shearing and compacting press for the production of pressed parts, preferably packages (20) from waste material, especially scrap and sheet clippings. The material used is pre-compacted in a first compacting step. In a second compacting step, the material, which has been pre-compacted to the width of the package, is subjected to intermediate compacting until the height of the package (20) is reached. In a third compacting step, final compacting of the material to the final width or length of the package (20) is carried out. According to the invention, the material is pre-compacted with a continuos force and optionally sheared until the compressor (3.1) reaches its final position. The compressor (3.2) is securely adjusted and guided to its end position on a parallel plane. Subsequently, the compressor (3.3) is guided in a position in which the compressor (3.1) releases the opening of the package chamber (2.3) when the compressor (3.1) is driven back. Finally, the compressor (3.1, 3.2, 3.3) is subjected to a pressure that is lower than the maximum pressure available in the compressors (3.1, 3.2, 3.3) at the beginning of the working and return strokes. The compressor (3.1) is subjected to maximum pressure for shearing and/or the compressors (3.2, 3.3) are supplied with maximum pressure to end pressing. The invention is also characterized in that the pressing pressure for the compressors (3.1, 3.2, 3.3) is gradually controlled depending on the degree of compression or the corresponding length.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/32; B30B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2006.01); B30B 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/326 (2013.01); B30B 9/301 (2013.01); B30B 9/3078 (2013.01); B30B 15/0082 (2013.01); B30B 15/0088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804789 A1 19990812; DE 19804789 B4 20040408; AT 223305 T 20020915; AU 2609699 A 19990823; AU 738844 B2 20010927; AU 738844 C 20030109; BR 9907690 A 20001114; CA 2320205 A1 19990812; CA 2320205 C 20080715; CN 1150084 C 20040519; CN 1291937 A 20010418; CZ 20002875 A3 20010516; CZ 301619 B6 20100505; EP 1056589 A1 20001206; EP 1056589 B1 20020904; ES 2184412 T3 20030401; JP 2003532538 A 20031105; JP 3978466 B2 20070919; NO 20003846 A 20001002; NO 20003846 D0 20000727; NO 325158 B1 20080211; PT 1056589 E 20030131; RU 2201869 C2 20030410; US 6546855 B1 20030415; WO 9939900 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-21 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: METSO MINERALS (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH; DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD

- Effective date: 20150517

2016-09-14 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: METSO GERMANY GMBH; DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: HC

- Effective date: 20160517

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160202

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59902557

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902557

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150805

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150123

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150122

2015-10-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20020404071

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20150805

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150122

2015-07-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902557

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59902557

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184412

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020404071

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021202

2003-01-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902557

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-10

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 223305

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020228

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE