Global Patent Index - EP 1056614 A1

EP 1056614 A1 2000-12-06 - ARRANGEMENT OF A CHILD SEAT ON AN AUTOMOBILE SEAT WITH A ROLL-OVER PROTECTIVE DEVICE

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT OF A CHILD SEAT ON AN AUTOMOBILE SEAT WITH A ROLL-OVER PROTECTIVE DEVICE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG EINES KINDERSITZES AUF EINEM SITZ EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES MIT EINER ÜBERROLLSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT D'UN SIEGE POUR ENFANT SUR LE SIEGE D'UN VEHICULE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION AGISSANT EN CAS DE TONNEAUX

Publication

EP 1056614 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910189 A

Priority

  • DE 19807318 A
  • EP 9900706 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807318A1] A holder (6) joins the top part (7) of the child's seat to the roll-over bow (11) and (6) has an included belt (8). The roll-over bow has a receiver (10) for the seat (2) holder (6) or for the holder of a load on the seat. The receiver (10) on the outside of the bow comes in eyelet form and the roll-over bow part facing the car seat (1) has an opening eyelet for a pin fitted into the bow (12). Otherwise the bow has two web-linked openings in its part facing the car seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60N 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/286 (2013.01); B60N 2/2806 (2013.01); B60N 2/2809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942322A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807318 A1 19990826; EP 1056614 A1 20001206; WO 9942322 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20011007

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60N 2/28 A

2001-02-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT OF A CHILD SEAT ON AN OPEN TOP AUTOMOBILE SEAT AND ROLL-OVER PROTECTIVE DEVICE

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60N 2/28 A

2001-01-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT OF A CHILD SEAT ON AN OPEN TOP AUTOMOBILE SEAT AND A ROLL-OVER PROTECTIVE DEVICE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE