Global Patent Index - EP 1056671 A1

EP 1056671 A1 2000-12-06 - GUIDING ROLLER

Title (en)

GUIDING ROLLER

Title (de)

LEITWALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU-GUIDE

Publication

EP 1056671 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915468 A

Priority

  • DE 9900348 W
  • DE 19805215 A
  • DE 19805214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940005A1] The invention relates to a guiding roller having, at least at its two ends, expanding members with a variable diameter which help compensate the running faults of strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/025 (2006.01); B65H 23/038 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 23/0251 (2013.01); B65H 23/038 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1121 (2013.01); B65H 2404/11211 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1321 (2013.01); B65H 2404/137 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940006A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940005 A1 19990812; EP 1053200 A1 20001122; EP 1053200 B1 20011128; EP 1056671 A1 20001206; EP 1056671 B1 20011128; WO 9940006 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-10

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI