Global Patent Index - EP 1056674 A1

EP 1056674 A1 2000-12-06 - INFORMATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM FOR USE IN AN ELEVATOR

Title (en)

INFORMATION DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM FOR USE IN AN ELEVATOR

Title (de)

IM AUFZUG GEBRAUCHTES MELDUNGS-LIEFERUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION D'INFORMATIONS UTILISE DANS UN ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1056674 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903212 A

Priority

  • US 9901169 W
  • US 927998 A
  • US 12328498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936341A1] The invention relates to features a system which distributes "real-time" information along with digital advertising to elevator display unit mounted in elevators. The system includes an elevator display unit having a display monitor for displaying general and commercial information to passengers within the elevator, and a local server which, receives scheduling information from a remote production server over a data communication path and, in accordance with the scheduling information, retrieves and formats the general and commercial information for display at the elevator display unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/008 (2013.01); B66B 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936341 A1 19990722; CA 2318094 A1 19990722; CA 2318094 C 20040406; CN 1241814 C 20060215; CN 1288439 A 20010321; DE 69932415 D1 20060831; DE 69932415 T2 20070719; EP 1056674 A1 20001206; EP 1056674 A4 20010711; EP 1056674 B1 20060719; HK 1034949 A1 20060915; JP 2002509066 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932415 P 20060831

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIFRANZA, MICHAEL, J.

2005-03-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEWVILLE, TODD, A.

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, INC.

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040601

2001-07-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB