Global Patent Index - EP 1056676 A1

EP 1056676 A1 2000-12-06 - BELT-CLIMBING ELEVATOR HAVING DRIVE IN COUNTERWEIGHT

Title (en)

BELT-CLIMBING ELEVATOR HAVING DRIVE IN COUNTERWEIGHT

Title (de)

RIEMENKLETTERNDER AUFZUG MIT ANTRIEB IM GEGENGEWICHT

Title (fr)

ASCENCEUR A MONTEE SUR COURROIE DOTE D'UN CONTREPOIDS A ENTRAINEMENT INTEGRE

Publication

EP 1056676 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908277 A

Priority

  • US 9903641 W
  • US 3110898 A
  • US 16358498 A
  • US 21899098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943592A1] An elevator system includes a counterweight-drive assembly (26) having a motor (32) and drive pulley (36) mounted internally to engage a drive belt (42) for climbing or descending with respect thereto, resulting in raising or lowering of an elevator car (12) coupled to said counterweight-drive assembly (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/02; B66B 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 9/02 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0055 (2013.01); B66B 9/02 (2013.01); B66B 9/027 (2013.01); B66B 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943592A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943592 A1 19990902; BR 9908227 A 20001031; CN 1299333 A 20010613; DE 69939773 D1 20081204; DE 69941801 D1 20100121; EP 1056676 A1 20001206; EP 1056676 B1 20081022; ES 2315007 T3 20090316; ES 2336495 T3 20100413; JP 2002504470 A 20020212; JP 4380914 B2 20091209; PT 1056676 E 20081218

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100219

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100819

2010-08-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100819

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090209

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2315007 T3

2008-12-18 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20081205

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69939773 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT