Global patent index - EP 1056679 A2

EP 1056679 A2 2000-12-06 - MACHINE-ROOMLESS ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH AN ELEVATOR MACHINE MOUNTED ON AN ELEVATOR CAR

Title (en)

MACHINE-ROOMLESS ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH AN ELEVATOR MACHINE MOUNTED ON AN ELEVATOR CAR

Title (de)

MASCHINENRAUMLOSES AUFZUGSSYSTEM MIT AUFZUGSANTRIEB IM AUFZUGSKABINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASCENSEUR EXEMPT DE LOCAL DE MACHINERIE, LA MACHINERIE ETANT MONTEE SUR LA CABINE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1056679 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99908278 A

Priority

  • US 9903644 W
  • US 3110898 A
  • US 16378598 A
  • US 21899098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943595A2] A machine-roomless elevator system (10) includes an elevator car (16) propelled by an elevator machine (32) mounted thereon and at least one flat rope (22) for suspending the elevator car (16) and providing traction therefor. Use of flat ropes combined with various roping arrangements reduces the size of the elevator machine (32) required to propel the elevator car (16). Smaller size elevator machines are more practical and result in cost savings for the elevator system (10). Additionally, placement of the elevator machine (32) on the elevator car (16) provides a safer environment for the elevator maintenance crew.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00; B66B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/02 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943595A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943595 A2 19990902; WO 9943595 A3 20000106; BR 9908305 A 20001031; CN 1291960 A 20010418; CN 1329274 C 20070801; DE 69908908 D1 20030724; DE 69908908 T2 20040519; EP 1056679 A2 20001206; EP 1056679 B1 20030618; ES 2196781 T3 20031216; JP 2002504472 A 20020212; PT 1056679 E 20031128

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150219

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150819

2015-08-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150819

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2196781

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69908908

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOLLOWELL, RICHARD, L.

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FARGO, RICHARD, N.

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RIVERA, JAMES, A.

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANSEVERO, FRANK

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ST. PIERRE, BRUCE

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT