Global Patent Index - EP 1056710 A1

EP 1056710 A1 2000-12-06 - DITERPENE DERIVATIVES AND ANTI-INFLAMMATORY ANALGESIC AGENTS COMPRISING THE SAME

Title (en)

DITERPENE DERIVATIVES AND ANTI-INFLAMMATORY ANALGESIC AGENTS COMPRISING THE SAME

Title (de)

DITERPENDERIVATE UND ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE SCHMERZMITTEL DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE DITERPENE ET AGENTS ANALGESIQUES ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES CONTENANT LESDITS DERIVES

Publication

EP 1056710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901968 A

Priority

  • KR 9900038 W
  • KR 19980002441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937600A1] The present invention relates to diterpene derivatives prepared from the components which are extracted from Acanthopanax Koreanum and represented by Chemical Formula (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 63/44; C07C 57/40; C07C 233/00; C07C 311/00; A61K 31/19; A61K 31/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/16 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/42 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); C07C 33/14 (2006.01); C07C 57/26 (2006.01); C07C 57/40 (2006.01); C07C 57/42 (2006.01); C07C 59/11 (2006.01); C07C 59/46 (2006.01); C07C 59/62 (2006.01); C07C 62/06 (2006.01); C07C 62/32 (2006.01); C07C 62/34 (2006.01); C07C 69/00 (2006.01); C07C 69/145 (2006.01); C07C 233/58 (2006.01); C07C 243/36 (2006.01); C07C 251/40 (2006.01); C07C 259/08 (2006.01); C07C 311/50 (2006.01); C07C 311/51 (2006.01); C07D 261/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 69/14 (2013.01); C07C 57/40 (2013.01); C07C 57/42 (2013.01); C07C 62/06 (2013.01); C07C 62/32 (2013.01); C07C 62/34 (2013.01); C07C 69/608 (2013.01); C07C 233/58 (2013.01); C07C 243/36 (2013.01); C07C 259/08 (2013.01); C07C 311/51 (2013.01); C07D 261/04 (2013.01); C07C 2603/26 (2017.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937600 A1 19990729; AU 2187699 A 19990809; CN 1171846 C 20041020; CN 1289319 A 20010328; DE 69913497 D1 20040122; DE 69913497 T2 20040916; EP 1056710 A1 20001206; EP 1056710 B1 20031210; ES 2211030 T3 20040701; JP 2003502271 A 20030121; JP 4615710 B2 20110119; KR 100566422 B1 20060324; KR 19990072290 A 19990927; US 6593363 B1 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110125

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913497

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110125

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110125

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211030 T3

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913497 P 20040122

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI