Global Patent Index - EP 1056735 A1

EP 1056735 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD OF PRODUCING EPOXY RESINS BY GAS PHASE EPOXIDATION

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING EPOXY RESINS BY GAS PHASE EPOXIDATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EPOXIDEN DURCH GASPHASENOXIDATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE RESINES EPOXY PAR OXYDATION EN PHASE GAZEUSE

Publication

EP 1056735 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964503 A

Priority

  • DE 19854615 A
  • EP 9909131 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19854615A1] The invention relates to a method of producing epoxy resins from hydrocarbons with olefinic double bonds, especially alkenes, by heterogeneous catalyzed oxidation in the gaseous phase. According to said method, an oxidic solid catalyst is released which contains iron as its active component at a concentration of 0.001-1 % and alkali and/or alkaline earth elements as the promoters. N2O is used as the oxidizing agent. The granulated oxidic solid catalyst, especially on the basis of SiO2 as the carrier, has a specific surface of greater than 50 m<2>/g. The ratio of the concentrations of the active components to the promoter components is preferably between 1:100 and 10:1. The partial oxidation of hydrocarbons with olefinic double bonds, especially propene, results in propene selectivities of 10-70 % at reaction temperatures of 300-500 DEG C and conversions of 2-30 %. The catalyst repeatedly used in the reaction process can easily be regenerated by oxidation in air so that it retains its high activity even after 50 or more regeneration cycles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 301/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 301/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 301/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031056A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854615 A1 19990701; DE 19854615 C2 20010809; AT 216697 T 20020515; BR 9907251 A 20001114; CN 1296479 A 20010523; EP 1056735 A1 20001206; EP 1056735 B1 20020424; US 6392065 B1 20020521; WO 0031056 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1056735E

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4W] PATENT WAS ACTUALLY WITHDRAWN AT THE EPO

- Free text: 20020309

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901297 20020529

2002-05-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020309

2002-05-08 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2002-04-30 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: DIE ERTEILUNG WURDE VOM EPA WIDERRUFEN.

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216697 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF PRODUCING EPOXIDES BY GAS PHASE EPOXIDATION

2001-07-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF PRODUCING EPOXIDES BY GAS PHASE EPOXIDATION

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE