Global Patent Index - EP 1056764 A1

EP 1056764 A1 2000-12-06 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND FÜR SIE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT LESDITES PROTEINES

Publication

EP 1056764 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907121 A

Priority

  • US 9903458 W
  • US 7503898 P
  • US 25160099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942470A1] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/705; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942470 A1 19990826; AU 2685599 A 19990906; CA 2320799 A1 19990826; EP 1056764 A1 20001206; EP 1056764 A4 20010829; JP 2002504488 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOBS, KENNETH

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCCOY, JOHN, M.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAVALLIE, EDWARD, R.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COLLINS-RACIE, LISA, A.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MERBERG, DAVID

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TREACY, MAURICE

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AGOSTINO, MICHAEL, J.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEININGER, ROBERT, J., II

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE