Global Patent Index - EP 1056812 A1

EP 1056812 A1 2000-12-06 - CORROSION-PROTECTIVE PIGMENT AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

CORROSION-PROTECTIVE PIGMENT AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

KORROSIONSSCHUTZPIGMENT UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PIGMENT ANTICORROSION ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1056812 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911608 A

Priority

  • DE 9900466 W
  • DE 19807808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807808A1] The invention relates to a corrosion-protective pigment for protecting the surfaces of metals or metal alloys. Said pigment is therefore used especially for protecting metal parts or metal alloy parts from corrosion. The pigment is characterised in that it is a) a mixture and/or a reaction product of acid aluminium tripolyphosphate with calcium and magnesium oxide, hydroxide or carbonate and/or b) hydroxylapatite and/or c) a mixture and/or a conversion product of hydroxylapatite with trimagnesium phosphate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 201/00 (2006.01); C09D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 5/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943757A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807808 A1 19990902; AU 3023699 A 19990915; EP 1056812 A1 20001206; EP 1056812 B1 20041201; JP 2002504615 A 20020212; JP 4367883 B2 20091118; NO 20004284 A 20000825; NO 20004284 D0 20000825; NO 322024 B1 20060807; WO 9943757 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120220

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911194

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911194 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEMISCHE FABRIK BUDENHEIM KG

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE