Global patent index - EP 1056832 A1

EP 1056832 A1 2000-12-06 - MULTI-PHASE SHAPED BODY WITH OPTIMIZED PHASE SPLIT

Title (en)

MULTI-PHASE SHAPED BODY WITH OPTIMIZED PHASE SPLIT

Title (de)

MEHRPHASEN-FORMKÖRPER MIT OPTIMIERTEM PHASENSPLIT

Title (fr)

CORPS MOULES A PLUSIEURS PHASES PRESENTANT UNE DIVISION DE PHASES OPTIMISEE

Publication

EP 1056832 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954404 A

Priority

  • CA 2315253 A
  • DE 19806220 A
  • EP 9806473 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806220A1] The invention relates to two-phase or multi-phase washing and cleaning agent shaped bodies consisting of compacted, particle-shaped washing and cleaning agents, comprising builder(s), bleaching agents, bleach activator(s) and optionally other washing and cleaning agent components. Optimum stability of oxidation-sensitive materials is achieved by physically separating the bleach activator(s) from the oxidation-sensitive materials in a defined region of the shaped body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3907 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 17/0082 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941350A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806220 A1 19990819; CA 2315253 A1 20001028; CN 1284990 A 20010221; CZ 20002997 A3 20010815; EP 1056832 A1 20001206; EP 1056832 B1 20020828; HU 0100816 A2 20010828; JP 2002503760 A 20020205; PL 342342 A1 20010604; SK 12032000 A3 20010212; WO 9941350 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20071026

2008-02-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20071026

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC THE PATENT DEPARTMENT

- Effective date: 20030520

2007-12-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030521

2007-12-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20030521

2006-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061005

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20030520

2004-07-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030521

2004-07-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-07-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER PLC

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021013

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 222949

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020130

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000805

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL