Global Patent Index - EP 1056833 A1

EP 1056833 A1 2000-12-06 - WASHING AND CLEANING AGENT SHAPED BODY WITH BLEACHING AGENT

Title (en)

WASHING AND CLEANING AGENT SHAPED BODY WITH BLEACHING AGENT

Title (de)

WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTELFORMKÖRPER MIT BLEICHMITTEL

Title (fr)

CORPS MOULES NETTOYANTS ET DETERGENTS CONTENANT DES AGENTS DE BLANCHIMENT

Publication

EP 1056833 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955440 A

Priority

  • CA 2315298 A
  • DE 19806200 A
  • EP 9806474 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806200A1] The invention relates to washing and cleaning agent shaped body containing bleaching agent. Said shaped bodies are characterized by elevated hardness and decomposition speed when the bleaching agent contained therein have a mean particle size of over 0.4 mm. Preferably, less than 30 % of the weight of the bleaching agent are particles with sizes under 0.4 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 3/3905 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941351A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806200 A1 19990819; AT 213768 T 20020315; CA 2315298 A1 20001029; CN 1284991 A 20010221; DE 59803243 D1 20020404; EP 1056833 A1 20001206; EP 1056833 B1 20020227; ES 2173640 T3 20021016; HU 0100727 A2 20010628; JP 2002503761 A 20020205; PL 342343 A1 20010604; SK 12022000 A3 20010510; WO 9941351 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20081114

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20081114

2009-03-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20081114

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20080611

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20021107

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20021125

2007-05-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20021125

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2006-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20021107

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20021125

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20021125

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

2005-08-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20021107

2005-08-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20021125

2005-08-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20021125

2003-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2003-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2003-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

2003-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20021107

2003-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20021125

2003-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER (UK) LIMITED

- Effective date: 20021125

2003-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173640 T3

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803243 20020404

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213768 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000805

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL