Global Patent Index - EP 1056852 A1

EP 1056852 A1 2000-12-06 - ANTI-ANGIOGENIC VACCINES: SUBSTANCES AND METHODS RELATING THERETO

Title (en)

ANTI-ANGIOGENIC VACCINES: SUBSTANCES AND METHODS RELATING THERETO

Title (de)

ANTI-ANGIOGENE IMPFSTOFFE, UND DAMIT IN ZUSAMMENHANG STEHENDE SUBSTANZEN UND METHODEN

Title (fr)

VACCINS ANTI-ANGIOGENIQUES: SUBSTANCES ET METHODES AFFERENTES

Publication

EP 1056852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906368 A

Priority

  • GB 9900583 W
  • GB 9804121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943801A1] Short amino acid sequences which present epitopes of Tek protein can be used as cancer vaccines to direct an immune cell response to endothelial cells. The peptides and polypeptides bind to MHC molecules, and the presentation of Tek epitopes can stimulate helper and/or cytotoxic T cell responses. Nucleic acids encoding the peptides, antibodies directed against the peptides, and pharmaceutical compositions comprising the peptides are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/00; C07K 14/71; C07K 16/28; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943801A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943801 A1 19990902; AU 2633199 A 19990915; EP 1056852 A1 20001206; GB 9804121 D0 19980422

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070208

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2005-12-21 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 SCANCELL LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANCER RESEARCH TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANCER RESEARCH VENTURES LIMITED

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE