Global Patent Index - EP 1056895 A1

EP 1056895 A1 2000-12-06 - COMPOSITE ELASTOMERIC YARNS AND FABRIC

Title (en)

COMPOSITE ELASTOMERIC YARNS AND FABRIC

Title (de)

KOMPOSIT ELASTOMER FADEN UND TUCH

Title (fr)

FILS ET TISSU ELASTOMERES COMPOSITES

Publication

EP 1056895 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909525 A

Priority

  • US 9903685 W
  • US 7543998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942644A1] The present invention relates to composite elastomeric yarns and fabrics, to methods of making same, and to articles in which such yarns and fabrics are used. The composite yarns of the present invention comprise an elastomeric core, an elastomeric thermoplastic sheath disposed about the core and, preferably, fibers mechanically anchored in the sheath. The composite fabrics of the present invention comprise the composite yarns of the present invention and conventional fibers arranged to form a fabric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 27/00; D02G 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/40 (2006.01); D03D 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/32 (2013.01); D02G 3/408 (2013.01); D03D 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942644A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942644 A1 19990826; WO 9942644 A9 19991104; DE 69907149 D1 20030528; DE 69907149 T2 20031016; EP 1056895 A1 20001206; EP 1056895 B1 20030423

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69907149

- Representative's name: RAINER CALLIES, DE

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69907149

- Representative's name: CALLIES, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907149 P 20030528

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE