Global Patent Index - EP 1056903 A1

EP 1056903 A1 2000-12-06 - FEEDING SYSTEM IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONTINUOUS COOKING OF CELLULOSE CONTAINING MATERIAL

Title (en)

FEEDING SYSTEM IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONTINUOUS COOKING OF CELLULOSE CONTAINING MATERIAL

Title (de)

ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG BEI DER KONTINUIERLICHEN KOCHUNG VON CELLULOSEHALTIGEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN RELATION AVEC LA CUISSON EN CONTINU DE MATERIAU CONTENANT DE LA CELLULOSE

Publication

EP 1056903 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906650 A

Priority

  • SE 9900162 W
  • SE 9800476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942653A1] A feeding system for feeding comminuted cellulose containing material and liquid to a continuously operating treatment vessel, which feeding sytem comprises a chute (2), operating at a first pressure level, with a liquid level and a level of material, a high pressure feeder (3) which, by means of rotating pockets, sluices (6) the material, together with all or a part of said liquid, to a second pressure level, which is higher than said first pressure level, for further conveyance to said treatment vessel, which high pressure feeder (3) also receives a return liquid flow (5), from said treatment vessel, at said second pressure level and recirculates a recirculation flow (4', 4") to said chute (2) or to said high pressure feeder (3). Said high pressure feeder (3) is, according to the invention, in open connection, with respect to both said liquid, and said comminuted cellulose containing material, with said recirculation flow (4', 4"), when any of the pockets of the high pressure feeder (3) is in a location which corresponds to an outlet (3b) for said recirculation flow (4', 4").

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942653A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942653 A1 19990826; AT 449881 T 20091215; AU 2650599 A 19990906; BR 9907838 A 20001024; BR 9907838 B1 20091201; CA 2317750 A1 19990826; CA 2317750 C 20071127; DE 69941682 D1 20100107; EP 1056903 A1 20001206; EP 1056903 B1 20091125; ES 2337532 T3 20100426; JP 2002504631 A 20020212; JP 4739518 B2 20110803; PT 1056903 E 20100211; SE 9800476 D0 19980218

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150210

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69941682

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-02-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 449881

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111223

2011-07-11 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110629

2011-06-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69941682

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110420

2011-02-16 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20110208

2010-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-04-26 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2337532

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2010-03-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2010-02-11 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-01-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69941682

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-01-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO FIBER KARLSTAD AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE