Global patent index - EP 1056905 A1

EP 1056905 A1 2000-12-06 - PAPER STRUCTURES HAVING A DECORATIVE PATTERN AND METHOD FOR MAKING

Title (en)

PAPER STRUCTURES HAVING A DECORATIVE PATTERN AND METHOD FOR MAKING

Title (de)

PAPIERSTRUKTUREN MIT EINEM DEKORATIVEN MOTIV UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

STRUCTURES DE PAPIER COMPORTANT DES MOTIFS DECORATIFS

Publication

EP 1056905 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905695 A

Priority

  • US 9902343 W
  • US 1759998 A
  • US 1783198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939050A1] A paper web and method of making the paper web are disclosed. The paper web has a background portion and a non-embossed decorative pattern. The decorative pattern has at least one high basis weight region having a basis weight greater than the average basis weight of the surrounding background portion. The decorative pattern can include a number of discrete, decorative indicia. Each decorative indicia can be separated from adjacent decorative indicia by the background portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939050A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939050 A1 19990805; AU 2580099 A 19990816; AU 746267 B2 20020418; BR 9910197 A 20010109; CA 2319795 A1 19990805; CN 1293728 A 20010502; EP 1056905 A1 20001206; JP 2002501992 A 20020122; NZ 506228 A 20030630

INPADOC legal status

2007-09-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1034102

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-04-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040212

2002-08-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PAPER STRUCTURES HAVING A DECORATIVE PATTERN AND METHOD FOR MAKING

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE