Global Patent Index - EP 1056906 A1

EP 1056906 A1 2000-12-06 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR INCORPORATING BINDERS DURING GROUND STABILISATION

Title (en)

METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR INCORPORATING BINDERS DURING GROUND STABILISATION

Title (de)

METHODEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINBRINGEN VON BINDEMITTEL BEI DER BODENSTABILISIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'INCORPORER DES LIANTS PENDANT LA STABILISATION D'UN SOL

Publication

EP 1056906 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903544 A

Priority

  • AU 9900092 W
  • AU PP183498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942665A1] A method for incorporating binders during ground stabilisation, the method including continuously preparing ground in a mixing chamber (28) and adding binder in a substantially dry form directly to the mixing chamber. The binder may be supplied from a binder handling system which includes a continuously alternating, pressurised, multi-chamber binder-supply system having at least two supply chambers (36, 38) that are separately capable of being pressurised or placed under suction to continuously supply and maintain substantially full a binder reservoir (40). Also described is apparatus for incorporating binders during ground stabilisation, the apparatus being in the form of a machine capable of traversing the ground. The machine has a ground breaking assembly (20) with a mixing chamber (28), the ground breaking assembly being capable of co-operating with a binder handling system that is capable of continuously adding binder in a substantially dry form directly into the mixing chamber (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 21/00; G01F 11/02; G01F 11/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 21/00 (2006.01); G01F 11/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 11/284 (2013.01); E01C 21/00 (2013.01); G01F 11/282 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942665 A1 19990826; AU PP183498 D0 19980312; EP 1056906 A1 20001206; EP 1056906 A4 20040303; ZA 200004859 B 20001121; ZA 9901260 B 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050421

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WORKS INFRASTRUCTURE PTY LIMITED

2004-03-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01C 21/00 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01F 11/02 B

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01F 11/28 B

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE