Global Patent Index - EP 1056907 A1

EP 1056907 A1 2000-12-06 - AUTONOMOUS STRIP LAYING DEVICE

Title (en)

AUTONOMOUS STRIP LAYING DEVICE

Title (de)

UNABHÄNGIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON BÄNDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF AUTONOME DE POSE DE BANDES

Publication

EP 1056907 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904904 A

Priority

  • FR 9900345 W
  • FR 9802046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775010A1] The invention concerns an autonomous strip laying device (1), in particular for marking the ground, consisting essentially of a rolling frame supporting a reel (11) of strip (2) to be unwound, a strip unwinding assembly (19), means for applying (34) the strip (2) on the ground comprising an applicator roll (33), a device for sectioning (29) the strip and an assembly driving the frame and actuating the different devices and the unwinding means. The invention is characterised in that said assembly unwinding (19) the strip (2) and said means applying (34) the strip (2) are, at least during the unwinding and laying of the strip (2), mutually synchronised in rotation by synchronising means (21", 22", 23", 26, 26', 27", 31", 32", 33", 35, 38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/185 (2013.01); Y10T 83/896 (2015.04); Y10T 156/1348 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941458A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775010 A1 19990820; FR 2775010 B1 20000512; AT 304080 T 20050915; CA 2320861 A1 19990819; DE 69927135 D1 20051013; DE 69927135 T2 20060713; EP 1056907 A1 20001206; EP 1056907 B1 20050907; US 6413013 B1 20020702; WO 9941458 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-04-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO., ST. PAUL, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: REQUENA, JULIEN, NANCRAY, FR

- Document: DE 69927135

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-04-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: 3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: REQUENA, JULIEN, NANCRAY, FR

- Document: DE 69927135

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070216

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *REQUENA JULIEN

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070216

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070216

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2005-12-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-12-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051218

2005-12-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927135 P 20051013

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030717

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE