Global Patent Index - EP 1056915 A1

EP 1056915 A1 2000-12-06 - DOOR LOCK

Title (en)

DOOR LOCK

Title (de)

TÜRSCHLOSS

Title (fr)

SERRURE

Publication

EP 1056915 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99965431 A

Priority

  • DE 19858174 A
  • EP 9909421 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19858174A1] The invention relates to a door lock (1), comprising a lock bolt (2) and/or a latch (3), and a control element which mechanically or electrically controls said latch (3) and which has a control shaft (5) and a control head (6). When the door is closed, said control element lies against the lock plate (8). The invention is characterised in that the control head (6) is linked to the control shaft (5) in such a way that it can pivot in relation to said control shaft (5), out of a middle position, in relation to the middle longitudinal axis (12) of the control shaft (5), about an axis (11) which extends in the longitudinal direction of the door lock, and in such a way that it is limited in both directions of motion. Consequently, when the control head (6) lies on the pivoting boundary, one wedge surface (14a) always lies parallel to the middle longitudinal axis (12) of the control head (6) and the other wedge surface (14b) always lies at an angle of approximately 45 DEG to said middle longitudinal axis and is configured as a stopping slope.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/20; E05B 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 55/12 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 55/12 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); E05B 63/044 (2013.01); E05B 2015/105 (2013.01); E05B 2063/207 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036253A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858174 A1 20000629; DE 19858174 C2 20010510; AT 259023 T 20040215; DK 1056915 T3 20040614; EP 1056915 A1 20001206; EP 1056915 B1 20040204; ES 2216627 T3 20041016; PT 1056915 E 20040630; WO 0036253 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151202

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 259023

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20151202

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-06-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 259023

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59908469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BALDER IP LAW, S.L., ES

2015-04-29 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-04-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-03-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-03-13 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59908469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DORMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-09-30 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: DORMA GMBH + CO. KG;DORMA PLATZ 1;58256 ENNEPETAL (DE)

2005-12-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051202

2005-09-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-07-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-12-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216627

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-06-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040401297

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-05-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040422

2004-04-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE