Global Patent Index - EP 1056932 A1

EP 1056932 A1 2000-12-06 - TURBINE HOUSING

Title (en)

TURBINE HOUSING

Title (de)

TURBINENGEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

ENVELOPPE DE TURBINE

Publication

EP 1056932 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966202 A

Priority

  • DE 9803607 W
  • DE 19806809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806809C1] The present invention relates to a turbine housing (1) which comprises an inner housing (2) surrounded by an outer housing (3), wherein said inner (2) and outer (3) housings each have a first upper partial region (5) as well as a second lower partial region (6) with the outer surface (7) of the inner housing facing from a distance the inner surface (8) of the outer housing. The outer surface (7) of the inner housing, in a portion at least of the first partial region (5), is used for the radiation transmission of heat to the inner surface (8) of the opposite outer housing, wherein said heat transmission is lower than that occurring in a portion at least of the second partial region (6) on the outer surface (7) of the inner housing. This can be achieved due to appropriate surface coatings which are applied in the corresponding regions and which have different absorption and/or emission indices (a1, a2). A temperature equilibrium can thus be obtained between the upper surface and the lower surface of the respective housings (2, 3) so as to prevent any buckling thereof upon cooling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/26; F01D 25/10; F01D 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/12 (2006.01); F01D 25/14 (2006.01); F01D 25/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942705A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806809 C1 19990325; CN 1119509 C 20030827; CN 1286739 A 20010307; EP 1056932 A1 20001206; EP 1056932 B1 20020925; JP 2002504641 A 20020212; JP 4213863 B2 20090121; US 6345953 B1 20020212; WO 9942705 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-31

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011214

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI