Global Patent Index - EP 1056942 A1

EP 1056942 A1 2000-12-06 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A SENSOR AND AN INTERFACE FOR DIGITISING MEASUREMENT VALUES

Title (en)

CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A SENSOR AND AN INTERFACE FOR DIGITISING MEASUREMENT VALUES

Title (de)

STEUERSYSTEM FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT EINEM SENSOR UND EINER SCHNITTSTELLE ZUR DIGITALISIERUNG DER MESSWERTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE COMPORTANT UN CAPTEUR ET UNE INTERFACE POUR LA NUMERISATION DES VALEURS DE MESURE

Publication

EP 1056942 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934326 A

Priority

  • DE 9900100 W
  • DE 19807215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807215A1] The control system has an engine management unit (1), an exhaust gas probe (2) with an interface (21) to the engine controller, an evaluation unit (211) integrated into the interface for digitising measurement values, a connecting line between the probe and interface for transferring probe measurement values and a connecting line (11) for transferring the digitised measurement values from the evaluation unit to the controller. The interface is a plug connector whose housing (23) contains the evaluation unit (211), which is integrated into it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1494 (2013.01); H01R 13/6683 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807215 A1 19990826; DE 19807215 C2 20000608; BR 9908092 A 20001031; CA 2321501 A1 19990826; CN 1114755 C 20030716; CN 1287591 A 20010314; EP 1056942 A1 20001206; EP 1056942 B1 20020828; ES 2183580 T3 20030316; JP 2002504648 A 20020212; US 7050902 B1 20060523; WO 9942717 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-08-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-01-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040113

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183580 T3

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902462 20021002

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE