Global Patent Index - EP 1056943 A1

EP 1056943 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR INJECTING FUEL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INJECTING FUEL

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1056943 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948669 A

Priority

  • DE 9902260 W
  • DE 19859424 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19859424A1] The invention relates to a method for injecting fuel in an internal combustion engine. The injection is carried out alternately in a homogeneous normal operation mode or in an inhomogeneous shift operation mode. According to the invention, a variable for at least one cylinder of the internal combustion engine is acquired during the inhomogeneous shift operation mode, whereby said variable is a knocking characteristic. At least one cylinder in the inhomogeneous shift operation mode is shifted into the homogeneous normal operation mode when the acquired characteristic variable of the one cylinder meets a predetermined first criterion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30; F02D 41/14; F02D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 35/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02P 5/152 (2006.01); F02P 5/153 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/027 (2013.01); F02D 41/008 (2013.01); F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F02D 41/1402 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0037788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19859424 A1 20000629; EP 1056943 A1 20001206; EP 1056943 B1 20040121; JP 2002533606 A 20021008; US 6612283 B1 20030902; WO 0037788 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040720

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908366 P 20040226

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE