Global Patent Index - EP 1056983 A1

EP 1056983 A1 2000-12-06 - SOUND-MODERATOR DEVICES FOR GUNS

Title (en)

SOUND-MODERATOR DEVICES FOR GUNS

Title (de)

SCHALLDÄMPFER FÜR FEUERWAFFEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS AMORTISSEURS DE SON POUR ARMES A FEU

Publication

EP 1056983 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901790 A

Priority

  • GB 9900235 W
  • GB 9801785 A
  • GB 9815092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939147A1] An gun-silencer (1) for mounting at the muzzle (9) of a gun-barrel comprises a baffle-free, generally-cylindrical gas-expansion chamber (2) intermediate a proximal entry-port (6) and a distal exit-port (7) both aligned with said gun-barrel when mounted thereon, the internal end walls of said expansion chamber being divergent from the entry-port at its proximal (3) end over a curve whose ends subtend an angle not greater than 90 DEG , and convergent on the exit-port (6) at its distal end (7) over a curve whose ends subtend an angle greater than 90 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939147A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939147 A1 19990805; AT 217074 T 20020515; AU 2178899 A 19990816; DE 69901384 D1 20020606; EP 1056983 A1 20001206; EP 1056983 B1 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-01-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020803

2002-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901384 20020606

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE LI SE

2002-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217074 T 20020515

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE LI SE