Global Patent Index - EP 1057011 A1

EP 1057011 A1 2000-12-06 - ULTRASONIC APPARATUS FOR CHARACTERIZING WOODEN MEMBERS USING A MEASUREMENT OF WAVE DISTORTION

Title (en)

ULTRASONIC APPARATUS FOR CHARACTERIZING WOODEN MEMBERS USING A MEASUREMENT OF WAVE DISTORTION

Title (de)

ULTRASCHALLGERÄT ZUR KARAKTERISIERUNG VON HOLZTEILEN DURCH MESSUNG VON WELLENVERFORMUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ULTRASONORE POUR CARACTERISER DES ELEMENTS EN BOIS AU MOYEN D'UNE MESURE PAR DISTORSION D'ONDE

Publication

EP 1057011 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908387 A

Priority

  • US 9903919 W
  • US 7609098 P
  • US 8201898 P
  • US 8201298 P
  • US 15143298 A
  • US 19716598 A
  • US 19667498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944049A1] Ultrasonic technique is applied to the measurement of wooden member (10) to identify localized anomalies internal to the wooden member (10) substantially smaller than the full width of the ultrasonic beam (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 29/04 (2006.01); G01N 29/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 29/2493 (2013.01); G01N 2291/0238 (2013.01); G01N 2291/0421 (2013.01); G01N 2291/0422 (2013.01); G01N 2291/044 (2013.01); G01N 2291/048 (2013.01); G01N 2291/102 (2013.01); G01N 2291/103 (2013.01); G01N 2291/105 (2013.01); G01N 2291/2634 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944049 A1 19990902; AU 2783299 A 19990915; AU 754908 B2 20021128; CA 2321576 A1 19990902; CA 2321576 C 20071204; EP 1057011 A1 20001206; EP 1057011 A4 20030813; NO 20004275 A 20001018; NO 20004275 D0 20000825; NZ 506565 A 20021025

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 29/04 A

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 29/06 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 29/10 B

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/46 B

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: U.S. NATURAL RESOURCES, INC.

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PERCEPTRON, INC.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAFER, MARK, E.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSS, ROBERT, J.

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE