Global Patent Index - EP 1057024 A1

EP 1057024 A1 2000-12-06 - METHODS USING PLA 2? AS A MARKER OF METASTASES AND FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF SELECTED CANCERS

Title (en)

METHODS USING PLA 2? AS A MARKER OF METASTASES AND FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF SELECTED CANCERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON PLA 2? ALS METASTASENMARKER UND ZUR DIAGNOSE ASUGEWÄHLTER KARZINOME

Title (fr)

PROCEDES METTANT EN APPLICATION PLA 2? EN TANT QUE MARQUEUR DE METASTASES ET AFIN DE DIAGNOSTIQUER DES CANCERS SELECTIONNES

Publication

EP 1057024 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934342 A

Priority

  • US 9903170 W
  • US 7550498 P
  • US 11193898 A
  • US 17550498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942830A1] The present invention provides methods of monitoring a cancer in a patient which has not metastasized for the onset of metastasis by measuring PLA2 levels in the patient. Also provided are methods for diagnosing a cancer in a patient and monitoring progression, remission, response to therapy and stabilization of a cancer in a patient based upon PLA2 levels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57488 (2013.01); C07K 16/40 (2013.01); G01N 2800/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942830 A1 19990826; CA 2320843 A1 19990826; EP 1057024 A1 20001206; EP 1057024 A4 20021030; JP 2002511564 A 20020416; JP 3524876 B2 20040510

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040402

2002-10-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01N 33/574 A, 7G 01N 33/53 B

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIADEXUS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE