Global Patent Index - EP 1057114 A2

EP 1057114 A2 2000-12-06 - AN INTERACTIVE DESIGN TOOL FOR SHARED MEMORY SPACES

Title (en)

AN INTERACTIVE DESIGN TOOL FOR SHARED MEMORY SPACES

Title (de)

INTERAKTIVES ENTWURF-WERKZEUG FÜR GEMEINSAME SPEICHERRÄUME

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE CONCEPTION INTERACTIF POUR ESPACES MEMOIRE PARTAGES

Publication

EP 1057114 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99908213 A

Priority

  • US 9903397 W
  • US 7604898 P
  • US 4493698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944140A2] An interactive design tool allows a designer to visually define object flow between computing resources and shared memory spaces in a distributed computing system. The design tool automatically converts the visual depiction of the object flow to computer code implementing the depicted object flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/50 (2006.01); H04L 12/433 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/433 (2013.01); G06F 8/30 (2013.01); G06F 9/465 (2013.01); G06F 9/5016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944140A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944140 A2 19990902; WO 9944140 A3 19991125; AU 2770399 A 19990915; CN 1292113 A 20010418; EP 1057114 A2 20001206; JP 2002505479 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021224

2002-09-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: INTERACTIVE DESIGN TOOL FOR SHARED MEMORY SPACES AND METHOD OF AUTOMATICALLY GENERATING COMPUTER CODE DEFINING OBJECT FLOW USING SAID DESIGN TOOL

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: INTERACTIVE DESIGN TOOL FOR SHARED MEMORY SPACES AND METHOD OF AUTOMATICALLY GENERATING COMPUTER CODE DEFINING OBJECT FLOW USING SAID DESIGN TOOL

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL SE