Global patent index - EP 1057129 A1

EP 1057129 A1 2000-12-06 - PERSONALIZED VIDEO CLASSIFICATION AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM

Title (en)

PERSONALIZED VIDEO CLASSIFICATION AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM

Title (de)

PERSONALISIERTES KLASSIFIKATIONS- UND WIEDERAUFFINDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR VIDEOS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PERSONNALISE DE CLASSEMENT ET DE SAISIE VIDEO

Publication

EP 1057129 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99965522 A

Priority

  • EP 9910221 W
  • US 22027798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0039707A1] A video retrieval system is presented that allows a user to quickly and easily select and receive stories of interest from a video stream. The video retrieval system classifies stories and delivers samples of selected stories that match each user's current preference. The user's preferences may include particular broadcast networks, persons, story topics, keywords, and the like. Key frames of each selected story are sequentially displayed; when the user views a frame of interest, the user selects the story that is associated with the key frame for more detailed viewing. This invention is particularly well suited for targeted news retrieval. In a preferred embodiment, news stories are stored, and the selection of a news story for detailed viewing based on the associated key frames effects a playback of the selected news story. The principles of this invention also allows a user to effect a directed search of other types of broadcasts as well. For example, the user may initiate an automated scan that presents samples of broadcasts that conform to the user's current preferences, akin to directed channel-surfing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/812 (2013.01); G06F 17/30787 (2013.01); G06F 17/30796 (2013.01); G06F 17/30828 (2013.01); G06F 17/30843 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 21/4532 (2013.01); H04N 21/454 (2013.01); H04N 21/458 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039707A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0039707 A1 20000706; CN 1116649 C 20030730; CN 1298522 A 20010606; EP 1057129 A1 20001206; JP 2002533841 A 20021008

INPADOC legal status

2011-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110301

2007-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070928

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE