Global Patent Index - EP 1057133 A1

EP 1057133 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF DATA FILES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF DATA FILES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DATEIVERWALTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE FICHIERS DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1057133 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963301 A

Priority

  • CA 9801198 W
  • CA 2231019 A
  • CA 2233794 A
  • CA 2239015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944162A1] The present invention provides a network system for storage of medical records. The records are stored in a database on a server. Each record includes two main parts, namely a collection of data elements containing information of medical nature for a certain individual, and a plurality of pointers providing addresses or remote locations where reside other medical data for that particular individual. Each record also includes a data element indicative of the basic type of medical data found at the location pointed to by a particular pointer. This arrangement permits a client workstation to download the record along with the set of pointers which link the client to the remotely stored files. The identification of the basic type of information that each pointer points to allows the physician to select the ones of interest and thus avoids downloading massive amounts of data where only part of that data is needed at that time. In addition, this record structure allows statistical queries to be effected without the necessity of accessing the data behind the pointers. For instance, a query can be built based on keys, one of which is the type of data that a pointer points to. The query can thus be performed solely on the basis of the pointers and the remaining information held in the record.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/3418 (2013.01); G06F 19/322 (2013.01); G06F 19/323 (2013.01); G06F 19/3425 (2013.01); G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944162A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944162 A1 19990902; AU 1865599 A 19990915; CA 2239015 A1 19990824; CA 2239015 C 20051220; EP 1057133 A1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071207

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE