Global Patent Index - EP 1057156 A1

EP 1057156 A1 2000-12-06 - DETECTION OF TRAFFIC SITUATION WITH FUZZY CLASSIFICATION, MULTI-DIMENSIONAL MORPHOLOGICAL FILTRATION OF DATA AND DYNAMIC CONSTRUCTION OF DOMAINS

Title (en)

DETECTION OF TRAFFIC SITUATION WITH FUZZY CLASSIFICATION, MULTI-DIMENSIONAL MORPHOLOGICAL FILTRATION OF DATA AND DYNAMIC CONSTRUCTION OF DOMAINS

Title (de)

VERKEHRSLAGEERFASSUNG MIT FUZZY-KLASSIFIKATION UND MEHRDIMENSIONALER MORPHOLOGISCHER DATENFILTERUNG UND DYNAMISCHER DOMÄNENBILDUNG

Title (fr)

DETECTION DE LA SITUATION DE TRAFIC AVEC CLASSIFICATION FLOUE, FILTRAGE DE DONNEES MORPHOLOGIQUE PLURIDIMENSIONNEL ET CONSTITUTION DYNAMIQUE DE DOMAINES

Publication

EP 1057156 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915492 A

Priority

  • DE 9900523 W
  • DE 19807793 A
  • DE 19905284 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19944891A1] The method involves processing measurement values detected at different times. The detected traffic measurement values for each observed street are separated by location and time per measurement value category in repeated updated historical windows extending over a defined period from the current time to produce past traffic information and are entered and stored. The stored data are filtered with various filters, each forming a characteristic. The individual characteristics are combined to form a characteristic vector describing the traffic situation at each corresp. point in the traffic network. Traffic information for output is based on the characteristic vectors. An Independent claim is also included for a traffic situation detection center.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942971A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19944891 A1 20000420; AT 258330 T 20040215; DE 19944888 A1 20000210; DE 19944889 A1 20001123; DE 19944889 A8 20050630; DE 19944890 A1 20001123; EP 1057156 A1 20001206; EP 1057156 B1 20040121; ES 2211066 T3 20040701; WO 9942971 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DDG GESELLSCHAFT FUER VERKEHRSDATEN MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211066

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908367

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI