Global Patent Index - EP 1057157 A1

EP 1057157 A1 2000-12-06 - TRAFFIC GUIDANCE SYSTEM

Title (en)

TRAFFIC GUIDANCE SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERKEHRSLEITSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GUIDAGE DE TRAFIC

Publication

EP 1057157 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954177 A

Priority

  • DE 9802739 W
  • DE 19808158 A
  • DE 19809475 A
  • DE 9801301 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944185A1] The invention relates to a traffic guidance system for regulating, guiding and/or optimising traffic movements. A sensor is provided for detecting the momentary traffic situation. The aim of the invention is to control traffic movements effectively even when there are large volumes of traffic. To this end, the invention is characterised in that the sensor has a radio receiver and/or a receiver for optical signals and/or a receiver for acoustic signals for receiving the radio signals and/or optical signals and/or acoustic signals emitted by road users.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0967

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/07 (2006.01); G08G 1/08 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); G08G 1/0967 (2006.01); G08G 1/0968 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/08 (2013.01); G08G 1/096725 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096783 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944185A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944185 A1 19990902; AT 215251 T 20020415; AU 1142499 A 19990915; DE 19882277 D2 20010426; EP 1057157 A1 20001206; EP 1057157 B1 20020327; JP 2002505489 A 20020219; JP 3795752 B2 20060712

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080917

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080916

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080917

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080916

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080916

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080916

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IP2H A.G.

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-03-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174502 T3

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803578 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215251 T 20020415

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TTH AG

2002-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IP2H AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, JOERG

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000812

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT